SC S0179 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of United States Highway 701 North From Its Intersection With The City Limits Of The City Of Loris To A Point One Mile North Of This Intersection, And The Portion Of United States Highway 701 South From Its Intersection With The City Limits Of The City Of Loris To A Point One Mile South Of This Intersection "henry L. Nichols Highway", And Erect Appropriate Signs Or Markers Along Both Portions Of Highway That Contain These Words.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Henry L. Nichols Highway

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09HouseAdopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced
2021-01-14SenateAdopted, sent to House
2021-01-14SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback