SC S0177 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Act No. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow For Certification, Instead Of Requiring Extrinsic Evidence, Of The Authenticity Of Certain Domestic And Foreign Business Records Of Regularly Conducted Activity For The Records To Be Admissible And To Require A Criminal Penalty For False Certification
Title
Procedure for certification of domestic and foreign records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Act No. 4 | |
2015-04-02 | Effective date 03/27/15 | |
2015-03-27 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-03-25 | Ratified R 6 | |
2015-03-05 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-1 |
2015-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-34 Nays-0 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3124 (Similar To) 2015-02-10 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Putnam