SC S0176 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Act No. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Department Of Corrections And Local Detention Facilities Shall Provide The State Aeronautics Commission A List Of Designated Sites Or Facilities And Unmanned Aerial Vehicle Boundaries
Title
Drones, unlawful operation at corrections and local detention facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 14 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Act No. 184 | |
2018-05-24 | Effective date 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Signed By Governor | |
2018-05-14 | Ratified R 200 | |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2018-05-10 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-5 |
2018-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2018-05-09 | House | Amended |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-02 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-01-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Corrections and Penology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 1 | 300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 1 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 1 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 5 | 175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |