SC S0170 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-12 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The South Carolina Sales And Use Tax Act, By Adding Section 12-36-71, To Provide That A Retailer Is Presumed To Be Liable For The Sales Tax Or Responsible For Collecting And Remitting The Use Tax If The Retailer Enters Into An Agreement With A Resident Of This State Under Which The Resident, For Consideration, Refers Potential Customers, Whether By An Internet Link Or Otherwise, To Require Such Retailers To Obtain A Retail License And Remit Sales And Use Tax On All Taxable Retail Sales, And To Provide Exceptions.
Title
Sales and use tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Waive Rule 26b (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-05-12 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-4 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |