SC S0168 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide The State Department Of Education Shall Develop Recommendations For Reducing And Streamlining The Amount Of Paperwork And Reporting Requirements Of Teachers, Schools, And School Districts, To Provide Requirements For The Content Of These Recommendations, And To Provide The Department Shall Report Its Recommendations To The General Assembly Before August 1, 2019. - Ratified Title
Title
Reporting requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Act No. 99 | |
2019-02-28 | Effective date 02/21/19 | |
2019-02-21 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-02-20 | Ratified R 2 | |
2019-02-13 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-02-12 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-02-07 | House | Recalled from Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2019-01-31 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-01-30 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Amended |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |