SC S0165 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Act No. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Extend The Hunting Season Of Alligators On Private Lands To May Thirty-first
Title
Hunting alligators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Act No. 3 | |
2013-03-11 | Effective date 03/01/13 | |
2013-03-01 | Signed By Governor | |
2013-02-27 | Ratified R 3 | |
2013-02-21 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2013-02-20 | House | Roll call Yeas-111 Nays-0 |
2013-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |