SC S0163 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Chapter 3, Title 56 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Motor Vehicle Registration And Licensing, By Adding Article 148, To Provide That The Department Of Motor Vehicles May Issue "air Medal" Special License Plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air Medal license plate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-23 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2020-09-23HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2020-09-23HouseRead second time
2020-09-23HouseAmended
2020-09-22HouseRecalled from Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-06-24HouseReferred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2020-06-24HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-05-13 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-05-12SenateUnanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2020-05-12SenateRoll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
2020-05-12SenateRead second time
2020-05-12SenateAmended
2020-05-12SenateRecalled from Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3593 (Similar To) 2019-01-30 - Scrivener's error corrected

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback