SC S0155 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provide Eligibility For An Inmate Who Has Completed Sixty-five Percent Of His Sentence Under Certain Circumstances And To Provide That An Inmate's Work Credits, Education Credits, And Good Conduct Credits Must Be Used To Calculate His Date Of Eligibility For These Programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early release of inmates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Corrections and Penology
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Corrections and Penology
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0161 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Corrections and Penology

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2413150(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback