SC S0153 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act No. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allow The Exemption To The Surviving Spouse Of The Person On One Private Passenger Vehicle Owned Or Leased By The Spouse For The Spouse's Lifetime Or Until The Remarriage Of The Surviving Spouse
Title
Disabled veteran tax exemption
Sponsors
Sen. Katrina Shealy [R] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Floyd Nicholson [D] | Sen. Kevin Johnson [D] |
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Act No. 23 | |
2015-06-04 | Effective date 06/01/15 | |
2015-06-01 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified R 44 | |
2015-05-27 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2015-05-26 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Ways and Means |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |