SC S0152 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Signed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, So As To Enact The "county Green Space Sales Tax Act"; By Adding Article 10 To Chapter 10, Title 4, So As To Create The County Green Space Sales Tax, To Impose The Tax, To Provide For The Contents Of The Ballot And The Purpose For Which Tax Proceeds May Be Used, To Provide For The Imposition And Termination Of The Tax, To Provide That The Department Of Revenue Shall Administer And Collect The Tax, To Provide For Distributions To Counties And Confidentiality, And To Provide For Unidentified Funds, Transfers, And Supplemental Distributions. - Ratified Title

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Green Space Sales Tax Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-11 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 67 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-16 Signed By Governor
2022-05-12 Ratified R 166
2022-05-12SenateConcurred in House amendment and enrolled
2022-05-12HouseRead third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2022-05-11HouseRoll call Yeas-67 Nays-28
2022-05-11HouseRead second time
2022-05-11HouseAmended
2022-05-10HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2022-05-05HouseRequests for debate removed-Rep
2022-05-04HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2022-05-02 Scrivener's error corrected
2022-04-28HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2021-05-13HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2021-05-13HouseIntroduced and read first time
2021-05-13SenateRoll call Ayes-41 Nays-3
2021-05-13SenateRead third time and sent to House
2021-05-13SenateAmended
2021-05-12SenateAmended
2021-05-07 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-05-06SenateRoll call Ayes-43 Nays-1
2021-05-06SenateRead second time
2021-05-06SenateAmended
2021-05-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2021-05-06 Scrivener's error corrected
2021-05-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-12-09SenatePrefiled

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0152&session=124&summary=B
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20201209.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20210505.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20210506.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20210506A.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20210507.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20210512.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20210513.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20220428.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20220502.htm
Texthttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/152_20220511.htm
Supplementhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/fiscalimpactstatements/S0152%202021-01-12%20introduced.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19558
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=19720
Roll Callhttps://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=21305

Bill Comments

feedback