SC S0149 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 12-36-2120, Relating To Exemptions From Sales Tax So As To Provide Exemptions For Menstrual Hygiene Products; By Amending Section 12-36-2120, Relating To Exemptions From Sales Tax, So As To Provide Exemptions For Diapers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Menstrual Hygiene Products Tax Repeal

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-27 Scrivener's error corrected
2023-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced and read first time
2022-11-30SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2022-11-30SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3109 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard
H3110 (Similar To) 2023-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
H3563 (Similar To) 2024-05-29 - Act No. 131

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12362120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback