SC S0149 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-19 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permit Home School Students And Governor's School Students To Participate In Interscholastic Activities Of The School District In Which The Students Reside Subject To Certain Conditions, And To Provide Additional Requirements For Charter School Students To Participate In Interscholastic Activities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Access to Interscholastic Activities Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-19 Act No. 203
2012-06-18 Effective date 06/07/12
2012-06-07 Signed By Governor
2012-06-05 Ratified R 212
2012-05-31 Roll call Ayes-38 Nays-0
2012-05-31 Concurred in House amendment and enrolled
2012-05-31 Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments
2012-05-30 Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0
2012-05-30 Read second time
2012-05-30 Amended
2012-05-30 Requests for debate-Rep
2012-05-23 Committee report: Favorable with amendment Education and Public Works
2012-05-01 Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
2012-05-01 Introduced and read first time
2012-04-27 Read third time and sent to House
2012-04-26 Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day
2012-04-26 Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0
2012-04-26 Read second time
2012-04-26 Amended
2012-04-12 Minority Report Removed
2012-04-11 Committee report: Majority favorable, minority unfavorable Education
2011-01-11 Referred to Committee on Education
2011-01-11 Introduced and read first time
2010-12-01 Referred to Committee on Education
2010-12-01 Prefiled

Same As/Similar To

S0171 (Similar To) 2011-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Education
H4585 (Similar To) 2012-01-11 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5963100(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback