SC S0142 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 16-3-2010, Relating To The Definition Of "sex Trafficking", So As To Expand The Definition To Include Sexual Exploitation Of A Minor And Promoting Or Participating In Prostitution Of A Minor; And By Amending Section 16-3-2020, Relating To Trafficking In Persons, Penalties, Minor Victims And Defenses, So As To Provide That A Sex Trafficking Victim May Raise Duress And Coercion As An Affirmative Defense To Nonviolent Offenses Committed As A Direct Result Or Incident To The Trafficking, To Provide That A Minor Sex Trafficking Victim May Not Be Convicted For Nonviolent Offenses Committed As A Direct Result Or Incident To The Trafficking, And To Provide That A Minor Sex Trafficking Victim Cannot Be Found In Violation Of Or Be The Subject Of A Delinquency Petition If The Minor's Conduct Was A Direct Result Of Or Incidental To Or Related To Trafficking; And So As To Provide That The Provisions In This Act Are Retroactive.
Title
Safe Harbor for Exploited Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-03-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-03-15 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2023-02-27 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2023-02-08 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hutto (ch), Matthews, Rice, Senn, Adams |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |