SC S0142 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That For A Third Or Subsequent Offense, The Person Must Be Fined One Thousand Dollars, And Imprisoned For Up To Ninety Days Or Confined To The Person's Place Of Residence Pursuant To The Home Detention Act For Up To Ninety Days.
Title
Omnibus Crime Reduction and Sentencing Reform Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-26 Nays-18 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-13 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-36 Nays-0 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), Campsen, Hembree, McElveen, Thurmond |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 11 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 11 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 23 | 500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 3 | 560 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 5 | 920 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 21 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 21 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 21 | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 375 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 53 | 470 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 396 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 1 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2945 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
56 | 5 | 2990 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |