SC S0141 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make Application By The State Of South Carolina Under Article V Of The United States Constitution For A Convention Of The States To Be Called, Restricted To Proposing An Amendment To The United States Constitution To Impose Fiscal Restraints On The Federal Government Through A Balanced Budget Amendment.
Title
Convention of the States
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), McLeod, Rice, Garrett, Stephens |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Hutto, Young, McLeod, Garrett |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |