SC S0139 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Enacting The "south Carolina Constitutional Carry Act Of 2017", To Amend Section 16-23-20 Relating To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Firearm, To Affirmatively Assert That It Is Legal To Carry A Handgun In This State, Unless Otherwise Prohibited, With Location Exceptions Where Firearms Are Prohibited; To Amend Section 16-23-50(a)(2) To Provide That A Person Who Enters A Premises With A Sign Prohibiting Firearms While Possessing A Firearm Must Be Charged With Trespassing; To Amend Sections 16-23-420 And 16-23-430, Both Relating To The Possession Of A Firearm On School Property, So As To Delete References To Concealed Weapon Permits, To Delete The Term "weapon" And Replace It With The Term "firearm", And To Provide That Both Sections Do Not Apply To A Person Who Lawfully Is Carrying A Weapon Secured In A Motor Vehicle; To Delete Section 16-23-460 Related To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Concealed Weapon; To Amend Section 16-23-465, Relating To Penalties For Unlawfully Carrying A Firearm Onto The Premises Of A Business Selling Alcoholic Liquor, Beer, Or Wine For Consumption On The Premises, To Delete A Reference To A Person Carrying A Concealable Weapon Pursuant To Article 4, Chapter 31, Title 23, To Provide That This Section Does Not Apply To A Person Lawfully Carrying A Weapon Who Does Not Consume Alcoholic Liquor, Beer, Or Wine While Carrying A Weapon On The Business Premises And To Remove A Reference To "concealable Weapon" And Replace It With "weapon"; To Amend Section 23-31-215, Relating To The Issuance Of A Concealed Weapon Permit, To Delete The Provision That Requires A Permit Holder To Possess His Permit Identification When Carrying A Concealable Weapon, The Provision That Requires A Permit Holder To Inform A Law Enforcement Officer That He Is A Permit Holder And Present The Permit To The Officer Under Certain Circumstances And To Make Conforming Changes; To Amend Sections 23-31-220, Relating To A Property Owner's Right To Allow A Holder Of A Concealed Weapons Permit To Carry A Weapon Onto His Property, So As To Make Technical Changes, To Provide That This Provision Regulates Both Persons Who Possess And Do Not Possess A Concealable Weapons Permit; To Delete Sections 23-31-225 And 23-31-230 Relating To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Concealed Weapon Into A Residence And The Carrying Of A Weapon Between An Automobile And An Accommodation; To Amend Section 23-31-235 Relating To The Posting Of Signs Prohibiting "concealed Weapons" And Replace It With The Conforming Language Of "weapons"; And By Amending Section 10-11-320 Related To The Trespasses And Offenses Of Public Buildings On Capitol Grounds, To Delete The Term "concealable Weapons' Permit" And Replace With The Term "firearm".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Constitutional Carry Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Recall (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate: To Lay On The Table The Motion To Recall S. 139 From Jud. (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Scrivener's error corrected
2019-05-08SenateRoll call Ayes-23 Nays-19
2019-05-08SenateRecalled from Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Goldfinch (ch), M.B.Matthews, Senn
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H3456 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Crawford
S0400 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3999 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Haddon, Oremus

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1011320(n/a)See Bill Text
162320(n/a)See Bill Text
1623420(n/a)See Bill Text
1623430(n/a)See Bill Text
1623460(n/a)See Bill Text
1623465(n/a)See Bill Text
162350(n/a)See Bill Text
2331215(n/a)See Bill Text
2331220(n/a)See Bill Text
2331225(n/a)See Bill Text
2331230(n/a)See Bill Text
2331235(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback