SC S0137 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Committee report: Favorable Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Superintendent Of Education From The List Of State Officers Which The Constitution Requires To Be Elected And Provide That The Superintendent Of Education Must Be Appointed By The Governor, Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate, To Serve At The Pleasure Of The Governor Beginning In January 2023, Or Upon A Vacancy In The Office Of The Superintendent Of Education After The Date Of The Ratification Of This Amendment, Whichever Occurs First, And To Provide That The General Assembly Shall Provide By Law For The Duties, Compensation, And Qualifications For The Office.
Title
Amendment to the Constitution of S.C.
Sponsors
Sen. George Campsen [R] | Sen. Greg Hembree [R] | Sen. Wes Climer [R] | Sen. Thomas Young [R] |
Sen. Ross Turner [R] | Sen. Michael Fanning [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Young, Fanning |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3036 (Similar To) 2017-02-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Judiciary
H3146 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Effective date 05/14/18
H3146 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Effective date 05/14/18