SC S0135 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Combine The Bodies Into A Single Entity.
Title
Election Commission and Board of Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4805 (Similar To) 2014-05-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3198 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Conference committee appointed Clemmons, J.E. Smith, Ballentine
H3198 (Similar To) 2014-04-30 - Conference committee appointed Clemmons, J.E. Smith, Ballentine
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 27 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 335 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 27 | 430 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0135&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/135_20121218.htm |