SC S0129 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Secretary Of State From The List Of State Officers Which The Constitution Requires To Be Elected And Provide That The Secretary Of State Must Be Appointed By The Governor Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate For A Term Coterminous With The Governor Upon The Expiration Of The Term Of The Secretary Of State Serving In Office On The Date Of The Ratification Of This Provision.
Title
Amendment to the Constitution of S.C.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H4457 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary