SC S0129 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-21 - Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Ford, Hutto, Campsen, Campbell, S.Martin, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-21 - Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Ford, Hutto, Campsen, Campbell, S.Martin, Scott
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Delete The Comptroller General From The List Of State Officers Which The Constitution Requires To Be Elected And Provide That The Comptroller General Must Be Appointed By The Governor Upon The Advice And Consent Of The Senate For A Term Coterminous With The Governor Upon The Expiration Of The Term Of The Comptroller General Serving In Office On The Date Of The Ratification Of This Provision.
Title
Constitutional amendment proposed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-21 | Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Ford, Hutto, Campsen, Campbell, S.Martin, Scott | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3184 (Similar To) 2011-02-08 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Funderburk
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0129&session=119&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess119_2011-2012/prever/129_20101201.htm |