SC S0123 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Scott, Bennett
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Scott, Bennett
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To The Annual Session Of The General Assembly, To Require The Session To End On The Second Thursday In March In Even-numbered Years And On The Second Thursday In April In Odd-numbered Years; And To Amend Section 2-7-60, Relating To The General Appropriations Act, To Require The General Assembly To Pass Biennial Appropriations In Each Odd-numbered Year.
Title
Annual Session of the General Assembly
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Bright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), Scott, Bennett |
2015-02-05 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |