SC S0118 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-21 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Make A Conforming Amendment.
Title
Cancellation of license plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2013-02-20 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 37 | 2725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 39 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
12 | 54 | 85 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |