SC S0112 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), McElveen, Gambrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-26 - Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), McElveen, Gambrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating To Timely Requests For Contested Case Hearings, To Establish An Automatic Stay Concerning License Issuances, Renewals And The Like, And To Provide For The Circumstances Under Which The Automatic Stay May Be Lifted.
Title
Automatic stay concerning licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Massey (ch), McElveen, Gambrell |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Hembree (ch), McElveen, Gambrell |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3565 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
S0105 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Act No. 134
S0105 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Act No. 134
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=0112&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/112_20161213.htm |