SC S0110 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A Bill To Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws, 1976, By Adding Section 58-27-1025 To Allow The Public Service Commission To Authorize The Issuance Of Bonds For The Purposes Of Offsetting And Reducing Prudently Incurred Costs Due To A State Of Emergency Declared By The Governor Or Abandonment Of A Project Authorized Under Article 4, Chapter 33, Title 58, And To Establish The Requirements And Processes For The Authorization Of These Bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Subcommittee: Gambrell (ch), Hutto, Massey, Sabb, Climer
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Same As/Similar To

H4206 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
58271025(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback