SC S0090 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Amendment To Section 3, Article Xii Of The Constitution Of South Carolina, Relating To The Requirement That The General Assembly Provide For The Separate Confinement Of Juvenile Offenders From Older Confined Persons, To Change The Age For Which The General Assembly Shall Provide For The Separate Confinement Of Juvenile Offenders From "under The Age Of Seventeen" To "under The Age Of Eighteen".
Title
Separate confinement of juvenile offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Malloy (ch), McLeod, Senn, Adams, Garrett |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |