SC S0078 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-13 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That State Guard Members May Receive A Daily Stipend Or Per Diem Pay For Reasonable Expenses, Or Both, If Approved By The Adjutant General.
Title
Military leave
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Alexander [R] | Sen. Stephen Goldfinch [R] | Sen. Kent Williams [D] | Sen. Thomas McElveen [D] |
Sen. Ronnie Cromer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Amended |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable General |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 6 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 635 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 3 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |