SC S0078 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-12 - Act No. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit An Immediate Family Member Of A County Forfeited Land Commission Member From Purchasing Land From The Forfeited Land Commission On Which Their Relative Serves, And To Provide Exceptions
Title
Forfeited Lands Emergency Development Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Concur (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-12 | Act No. 59 | |
2015-06-11 | Effective date 06/04/15 | |
2015-06-04 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-03 | Ratified R 90 | |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-2 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment and enrolled |
2015-05-28 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-05-28 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-27 | House | Roll call Yeas-73 Nays-1 |
2015-05-27 | House | Read second time |
2015-05-27 | House | Amended |
2015-05-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-27-15 |
2015-05-19 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 5-20-15 |
2015-05-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-24 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-1 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3399 (Similar To) 2015-01-22 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary