SC S0046 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
Pending: House Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Person Is Not Required To Wear A Personal Flotation Device If The Person Is In Possession Of A Personal Watercraft That Is Located In Three Feet Of Water Or Less, And Is Anchored, And The Engine Is Not Operating.
Title
Personal flotation devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced and read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Read third time and sent to House | |
2011-02-03 | Roll call Ayes-35 Nays-0 | |
2011-02-03 | Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-02-02 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry | |
2011-01-11 | Introduced and read first time | |
2010-12-01 | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry | |
2010-12-01 | Prefiled |