SC S0032 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Scrivener's error corrected
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Amending Section 38-77-170, Relating To The Required Conditions To Sue Or Recover Under The Uninsured Motorist Provision When The Owner Or Operator Of The Motor Vehicle Causing Injury Or Damage Is Unknown, So As To Allow An Insured To Seek A Court Order For A Presuit Deposition When The Insured Is Unable To Obtain An Affidavit From A Witness To The Accident And To Allow An Insured To Submit Electronic Or Other Recording Of The Accident To Meet The Required Conditions Of The Uninsured Motorist Provision.
Title
Uninsured motorist coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Banking and Insurance |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Prefiled |