SC S0029 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Article 1, Chapter 21, Title 50 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To The Equipment And Operation Of Watercraft, By Adding Section 50-21-107, To Provide That Owners Of Watercraft Of More Than Fifty Horsepower Must Carry Liability Insurance Of At Least Fifty Thousand Dollars Of Coverage Per Occurrence, To Provide Penalties, And To Provide For The Collection Of Fines.
Title
Watercraft
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-4 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled |