SC S0011 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act No. 113
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act No. 113
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 1-1-30 So As To Provide That The South Carolina General Assembly Intends For Daylight Saving Time To Be The Year-round Standard Time Of The Entire State Should The United States Congress Amend Certain Related Federal Law To Allow States To Observe Daylight Saving Time Year Round. - Ratified Title
Title
Daylight saving time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Act No. 113 | |
2020-02-05 | Effective date See Act | |
2020-02-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-01-29 | Ratified R 114 | |
2020-01-15 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-10 |
2019-05-09 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-43 Nays-0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3246 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Burns, Loftis
H3335 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3335 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary