SC S0011 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Act No. 70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Public Bodies Shall Post Agendas For All Regularly Scheduled Meetings And Special Meetings, To Provide The Time And Manner For Posting These Agendas And Notices Of Meetings, To Specify Contents Required For These Meeting Notices, And To Provide For The Manner In Which These Agendas Subsequently May Be Amended
Title
Notice of meetings for public bodies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House: Adopt Free Conference Report (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 113 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - House: Granting Free Conference Powers (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt The Free Conference Report (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate: To Grant Free Conference Powers (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 0 N: 113 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate: To Adopt Amendment (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Act No. 70 | |
2015-06-17 | Effective date 06/08/15 | |
2015-06-08 | Signed By Governor | |
2015-06-04 | Ratified R 99 | |
2015-06-03 | House | Ordered enrolled for ratification |
2015-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-103 Nays-0 |
2015-06-03 | House | Free conference report received and adopted |
2015-06-03 | House | Free conference committee appointed Newton, Taylor, and Norrell |
2015-06-03 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-1 |
2015-06-03 | House | Free conference powers granted |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Free conference report adopted |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Free conference committee appointed Campsen, Gregory, Johnson |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Free conference powers granted |
2015-05-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Newton, Taylor, Norrell |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate insists upon amendment and conference committee appointed Campsen, Gregory, Johnson |
2015-05-06 | House | Roll call Yeas-0 Nays-113 |
2015-05-06 | House | Non-concurrence in Senate amendment |
2015-05-01 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2015-04-29 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2015-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-100 Nays-0 |
2015-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-32 Nays-0 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: L.Martin (ch), Rankin, Hutto, Malloy, Campsen, Massey, Gregory |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
H3192 (Similar To) 2015-02-18 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary