SC S0009 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 56-5-1885 So As To Provide The Circumstances When It Is Lawful To Drive A Vehicle In The Left Lane Of An Interstate Highway, And To Provide The Circumstances Under Which A Traffic Ticket May Be Issued For The Violation Of This Provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Left lane driving

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-03-19HouseIntroduced and read first time
2020-03-11SenateRoll call Ayes-42 Nays-1
2020-03-11SenateRead third time and sent to House
2020-03-11 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-03-10SenateHouse amendment amended
2020-03-04SenateRead second time
2020-02-05SenateCommittee report: Favorable Transportation
2019-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5651885(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback