SC S0009 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That The Optional Intoxicants And Narcotics Exclusion Provision Contained In Certain Insurance Policies That Require The Replication Of Exact Language As Provided In Section 38-71-370 Does Not Apply To A Medical Expense Policy, And To Define Medical Expense Policy
Title
Medical expense policy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Act No. 42 | |
2017-05-25 | Effective date 5/19/17 | |
2017-05-19 | Signed By Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Ratified R 63 | |
2017-05-11 | House | Roll call Yeas-92 Nays-0 |
2017-05-11 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-31 Nays-0 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | House amendment amended |
2017-05-05 | House | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments |
2017-05-04 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2017-05-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-2 |
2017-05-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-05-04 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-37 Nays-0 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Banking and Insurance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2016-12-13 | Senate | Prefiled |