SC S0002 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Act No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Act No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Sections 1-3-120, 1-3-130, 1-6-30, 1-9-30, 1-11-425, 1-18-70, 1-23-280, 1-23-290, 2-1-230, 2-1-250, 2-2-30, 2-2-40, 2-3-20, 2-3-75, 2-3-105, 2-15-60, 2-17-90, 2-17-100, 2-19-10, 2-41-70, 2-59-10, 2-67-20, 2-69-20, 2-69-40, 2-75-10, 3-11-400, 5-1-26, 6-4-35, 6-29-1330, 8-13-540, 8-13-715, 8-13-1373, 9-4-10, 9-4-40, As Amended, 9-16-90, 9-16-380, 10-1-168, 11-9-1140, As Amended, 11-11-350, 11-43-140, 11-45-40, 11-50-50, 11-57-340, 13-1-25, 23-1-230, 24-22-150, 37-29-110, 38-3-110, 40-47-10, 41-27-710, 44-59-50, 44-128-50, 46-3-260, 48-52-440, 48-59-40, As Amended, 51-13-720, 51-13-2120, 51-18-40, 51-18-115, 54-3-1300, 54-6-10, 59-6-10, 59-40-230, 59-46-40, 59-59-175, 59-150-40, 59-150-320, 59-150-325, 60-17-10, 63-1-50, 63-11-1720, As Amended, 63-11-1930, As Amended, 63-11-2110, And 1-11-10, As Amended, Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, All Relating To Appointments And Reports Received By The President Pro Tempore, So As To Substitute The "president Of The Senate" For The "president Pro Tempore Of The Senate", "president Pro Tempore", Or "president Of The Senate Pro Tempore" In Order To Conform The South Carolina Code Of Laws With Amendments To The South Carolina Constitution Act 214 Of 2014; To Amend Act 121 Of 2014, Relating To Appointments Made By The President Pro Tempore, So As To Make The Same Conforming Change; And To Amend Sections 1-17-20, 1-23-125, 2-3-30, 2-3-90, 7-11-30, 7-17-10, 10-1-40, 14-27-20, 14-27-30, 14-27-40, 14-27-80, 44-56-840, 54-7-100, And 59-6-15, All Relating To Appointments And Reports Received By The Lieutenant Governor, So As To Substitute "president Of The Senate" For "lieutenant Governor" Or To Strike References To The Lieutenant Governor In Order To Conform The South Carolina Code Of Laws Related To The Duties Of The Lieutenant Governor With Amendments To The South Carolina Constitution Act 214 Of 2014. - Ratified Title
Title
Senate Appointments and Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Act No. 1 | |
2019-02-07 | Effective date 01/31/19 | |
2019-01-31 | Signed By Governor | |
2019-01-30 | Ratified R 1 | |
2019-01-18 | House | Read third time and enrolled |
2019-01-17 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2019-01-17 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Polled out of committee Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Malloy, Massey, McElveen, Turner |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 11 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 11 | 425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 17 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 18 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 23 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 23 | 280 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 23 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 3 | 130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 6 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
1 | 9 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 168 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 11 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 43 | 140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 45 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 50 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 57 | 340 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
11 | 9 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
14 | 27 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 1 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 1 | 250 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 15 | 60 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 17 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 17 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 19 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 75 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 3 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 41 | 70 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 59 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 67 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 69 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 69 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 75 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 22 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 11 | 400 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
37 | 29 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 3 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 47 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
41 | 27 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 128 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 56 | 840 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
44 | 59 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 3 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 52 | 440 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
48 | 59 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 13 | 2120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 13 | 720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 18 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 18 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 3 | 1300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 6 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 7 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 150 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 150 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 150 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 40 | 230 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 46 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 59 | 175 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 6 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 6 | 15 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 29 | 1330 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 4 | 35 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
60 | 17 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 2110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 11 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
7 | 17 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 1373 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 540 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 380 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 16 | 90 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 4 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 4 | 40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |