SC S0001 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-16 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Section 1-3-210 Of The 1976 Code, Relating To Filling Vacancies When The Senate Is Not In Session, To Clarify That The Governor May Only Make An Interim Appointment To An Office Requiring The Senate's Advice And Consent If The Appointment Is Made During The Same Interim During Which The Office Becomes Vacant; To Provide That, If The Senate Does Not Confirm An Interim Appointment During The Next Ensuing Regular Legislative Session, The Governor May Not Make Another Interim Appointment; And To Provide That The Governor's Authority To Make An Interim Appointment Terminates When The General Assembly Convenes For The Regular Legislative Session Following The Interim Period During Which The Office Became Vacant.
Title
Senate Vacancies
Sponsors
Sen. Hugh Leatherman [R] | Sen. Harvey Peeler [R] | Sen. Nikki Setzler [D] | Sen. Shane Massey [R] |
Sen. Gerald Malloy [D] | Sen. Luke Rankin [R] | Sen. George Campsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-10 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-2 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read third time and sent to House |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-01-09 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Polled out of committee Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Campsen (ch), Malloy, Massey, McElveen, Turner |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Prefiled |