SC H5564 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amend Act 1041 Of 1970, As Amended, Relating To The Assessment Of Taxes In Oconee County, So As To Revise The Membership And Composition Of The Oconee County Board Of Assessment Appeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Act No. 1041; Assessment of taxes, Oconee County; revise membership and composition of Oconee County Board of Assessment Appeals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-22 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24SenateRead second time
2020-09-23SenateUnanimous consent for second and third readings on next two consecutive legislative days
2020-09-23SenateIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference
2020-09-23HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-09-22HouseRoll call Yeas-109 Nays-0
2020-09-22HouseRead second time
2020-09-16HouseDelegation report: Favorable Oconee Delegation
2020-09-15HouseReferred to Oconee Delegation
2020-09-15HouseIntroduced and read first time

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback