SC H5413 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 80-44)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-15 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
To Designate October 7, 2020, As The One Hundredth Anniversary Of The Aaa School Safety Patrol Program In The State Of South Carolina, And To Recognize The Anniversary In Conjunction With The Annual “walk Or Bicycle With Your Child To School Day”.
Title
AAA School Safety Patrol Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Education |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-03-26 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-03-19 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |