SC H5354 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportion The Specific Election Districts From Which Members Of The Board Of Trustees Of The School District Of Colleton County Must Be Elected Beginning With School District Elections In 2014, And To Provide For Demographic Information In Regard To These Newly Drawn Election Districts.
Title
Colleton County Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 57) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time, placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2014-06-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-06-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-62 Nays-0 |
2014-06-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-06-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1284 (Similar To) 2014-09-08 - Act No. 304
S1324 (Similar To) 2014-05-23 - Scrivener's error corrected
S1324 (Similar To) 2014-05-23 - Scrivener's error corrected