SC H5318 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Read third time and sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Read third time and sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Bill To Provide That Laurens County On July 1, 2021, Shall Consist Of One School District To Be Known As The Laurens County Consolidated School District And To Abolish The Existing School Districts In Laurens County; To Provide That The Consolidated School District Be Governed By A Board Of Trustees Elected In Nonpartisan Elections On Specified Dates; To Provide For The Composition And Manner Of Election Of The Board; To Provide A Superintendent For The District To Be Appointed By The Board; To Provide For The Powers And Duties Of The Board And Superintendent; To Provide For The Manner In Which School Budgets Must Be Presented And The School Tax Millage Be Imposed And Calculated; To Provide For The Transfer Of The Assets And Liabilities Of The Two Present School Districts To The Consolidated School District With Certain Exceptions; To Provide The Manner In Which The Constitutional Debt Limitation Of The Consolidated School District For The Issuance Of A General Obligation Bond Must Be Determined; And To Provide For A Six-member Transition Team To Be Appointed By The Boards Of District Two And District Seventeen To Make Recommendations Concerning Attendance Zones And Other Matters.
Title
Laurens County School Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2018-04-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-72 Nays-1 |
2018-04-26 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |