SC H5302 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection Located At The Junction Of South Carolina Highway 135 (cates Bay Highway) And Firehouse Road In Horry County "james Ronald Hucks Memorial Intersection" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Location Containing This Designation.
Title
James Ronald Hucks Memorial Intersection
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R] | Rep. Gregory Duckworth [R] | Rep. Timothy McGinnis [R] | Rep. William Hewitt [R] |
Rep. Kevin Hardee [R] | Rep. Heather Crawford [R] | Rep. Alan Clemmons [R] | Rep. Russell Fry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-05-09 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-04-25 | House | Introduced |