SC H5299 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Act No. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Require The Director Of The South Carolina Emergency Management Division To Develop A System By Which A Person Who Transports Goods Or Services, Or Who Assists In The Restoration Of Utility Services Can Be Certified For The Purpose Of Reentry Into An Area Subject To A State Or Local Curfew, To Provide Qualifications For Certification, And To Specify The Circumstances Under Which A Certified Person Is Allowed To Reenter Or Remain In A Curfew Area
Title
Governor's authority in times of emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Act No. 236 | |
2016-06-09 | Effective date 06/03/16 | |
2016-06-03 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 289 | |
2016-05-31 | House | Roll call Yeas-83 Nays-0 |
2016-05-31 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-42 Nays-0 |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on General |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-05-06 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-05-05 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2016-05-05 | House | Read second time |
2016-05-05 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.L.Brown |
2016-05-04 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Horne, Cole, Jefferson, Williams |
2016-05-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Bingham, Rutherford, Kennedy, Newton |
2016-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1263 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Referred to Committee on General