SC H5283 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Environmental Control, Relating To Administrative Procedures, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4810, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Administrative Procedures (D. No. 4810)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Recommitted to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures |
2018-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18 |
2018-04-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1171 (Similar To) 2018-04-25 - Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures