SC H5281 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation - Board Of Examiners For Licensure Of Professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists And Psycho-educational Specialists, Relating To Board Of Examiners For Licensure Of Professional Counselors, Marriage And Family Therapists And Psycho-educational Specialists, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4795, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Psycho-Educational Specialists, Board of Examiners (D. No. 4795)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-95 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18 |
2018-04-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S0972 (Similar To) 2018-02-21 - Recommitted to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry