SC H5280 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
Pending: Senate Fish, Game and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Natural Resources, Relating To Seasons, Limits, Methods Of Take And Special Use Restrictions On Wildlife Management Areas, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4799, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Wildlife Management Areas (D. No. 4799)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18 |
2018-04-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |