SC H5279 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Health And Human Services, Relating To Articles 4, 5, 7 And 8 Of Chapter 126, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4746, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Articles 4, 5, 7 and 8 of Chapter 126 (D. No. 4746)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2018-05-02 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-94 Nays-0 |
2018-05-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-04-26 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18 |
2018-04-19 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |
Same As/Similar To
S1075 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures