SC H5278 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs
Pending: Senate Medical Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Labor, Licensing And Regulation - Board Of Nursing, Relating To Nurse Licensure Compact, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4779, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nurse Licensure Compact (D. No. 4779)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Committee on Medical Affairs
2018-05-02SenateIntroduced and read first time
2018-05-02HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2018-05-01HouseRoll call Yeas-100 Nays-0
2018-05-01HouseRead second time
2018-04-26HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 5-1-18
2018-04-19HouseIntroduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference

Same As/Similar To

S1073 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Regulations and Administrative Procedures

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback