SC H5245 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Act No. 248
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That A Manufacturer, Brewer, Importer, Or Retailer May Offer Or Sponsor Certain Coupons And Rebates To A Consumer For The Purchase Of Beer, To Provide That A Wholesaler Is Prohibited From Participating In The Procurement, Redemption, Or Other Costs Associated For Any Coupon Or Rebate For Beer, And To Provide That A Beer Manufacturer Or Wholesaler Is Prohibited From Offering Paper Instant Redeemable Coupons And Scanback Coupons For Beer In This State
Title
Alcohol
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 24 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 78 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Act No. 248 | |
2016-06-10 | Effective date 06/05/16 | |
2016-06-05 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-06-02 | Ratified R 286 | |
2016-06-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-91 Nays-5 |
2016-06-02 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-41 Nays-4 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment Amended and Adopted |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Subcommittee: Rankin (ch), Allen, Bennett |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-05-03 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-28 | House | Roll call Yeas-78 Nays-25 |
2016-04-28 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-27 | House | Recalled from Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S1239 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary