SC H5212 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Cashua Ferry Road In Darlington County From Wilson Clinic To Its Intersection With Coggeshall Road "james 'jimmy' Mckelvey Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway Containing This Designation.
Title
James 'Jimmy' McKelvey Memorial Highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-04-26 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2022-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2022-04-21 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2022-04-05 | House | Introduced |