SC H5161 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That It Is Unlawful For A Person To Smoke A Tobacco Product In A Motor Vehicle In Which A Minor Is A Passenger, To Define The Terms "tobacco Product" And "minor", And To Provide A Penalty.
Title
Motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
S0964 (Similar To) 2018-02-06 - Referred to Committee on Transportation
H3241 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H4855 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
H3241 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works
H4855 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Referred to Committee on Judiciary
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=5161&session=122&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess122_2017-2018/prever/5161_20180320.htm |